Senate | 03/05/2025 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | 3rd reading, passed 88-7 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (2) | ||
House | 02/28/2025 | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 27, 2025 | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | reassigned to Local Government (H) | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | introduced in House |