Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
delivered to Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
passed 29-9
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
passed 78-22
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
veto overridden
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
posted for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
received in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Vetoed
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
passed 70-20
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
3rd reading, passed 28-9 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 13, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
returned to Licensing & Occupations (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
taken from Licensing & Occupations (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
to Licensing & Occupations (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
passed 62-33 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
floor amendment defeated Floor Amendments (2) and (3)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
floor amendments (2), (3) and (4) filed to Committee Substitute , floor amendment (5) filed to bill
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 25, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
introduced in House
|
|
|