Senate | 02/18/2025 | to Education (S) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | received in Senate | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | 3rd reading, passed 92-5 | ||
House | 02/07/2025 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 11, 2025 | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | to Primary and Secondary Education (H) | ||
House | 01/07/2025 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/07/2025 | introduced in House |