House | 04/01/2025 | signed by Governor | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | delivered to Governor | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | passed 88-10 | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | to Rules (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 27, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | to Transportation (S) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | received in Senate | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | 3rd reading, passed 88-6 | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 27, 2025 | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | to Transportation (H) | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | introduced in House |