House
|
04/10/2025
|
became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 162)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Governor delivered Bill and Veto Message to Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
line items vetoed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
passed 84-13
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Free Conference Committee report adopted in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
passed 32-3-2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Report
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
Free Conference Committee report filed in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Free Conference Committee report (1) filed in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Conference Committee report (1) filed in House and Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 14, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
3rd reading, passed 96-2
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 04, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
to State Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
introduced in House
|
|
|