House | 02/12/2025 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | received in House | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 07, 2025 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | 1st reading | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | introduced in Senate |