|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Gallot, Landry, and Henry.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Marionneaux, Kostelka, and Walsworth.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Notice House rejected Senate amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 19, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 13, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|