|
06/18/2010
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 14 yeas and 21 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
By a vote of 91 yeas, 0 nays the House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 17, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Reported with amendments (22-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|