|
06/03/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2010.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 46, nays 40. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 12, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Reported favorably (18-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 27, 2010.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 6, 2010.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2010
|
Reported favorably (12-2-1) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|