|
07/06/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 990.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
House conferees appointed: LaFonta, Wooton, and Hines.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Murray, Dorsey, and Martiny.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Notice House rejected Senate amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 25, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Reported favorably (12-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Read by title.
|
|
|