|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 58, nays 31. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 6, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 21. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 28, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Read by title.
|
|
|