LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1289
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB1289
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB1289
Action History
05/04/2010
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
04/29/2010
Scheduled for floor debate on May 4, 2010.
04/26/2010
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
04/22/2010
Reported with amendments (10-0-1) (Regular).
04/15/2010
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
04/14/2010
Read by title.