04/07/2010 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 30, nays 61. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
04/05/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 7, 2010. | |||
04/05/2010 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
03/31/2010 | Reported favorably (10-5) (Regular). | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |||
03/05/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2010. | |||
03/04/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |||
03/04/2010 | Prefiled. |