05/17/2010 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |||
05/13/2010 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
05/12/2010 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 54, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/07/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 12, 2010. | |||
05/06/2010 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
05/05/2010 | Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular). | |||
04/20/2010 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Education. | |||
04/19/2010 | Read by title. |