|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 45. Failed to pass.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2010.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 46, nays 43. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 24, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 17, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Reported with amendments (10-5) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read by title.
|
|
|