|
07/08/2010
|
Effective date: July 8, 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1040.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 13. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 5, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 28, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 450 reported by the Committee on Commerce (9-4).
|
|
|