|
07/07/2010
|
Effective date: July 1, 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 71.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
By a vote of 88 yeas, 0 nays the House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/7/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Reported favorably (17-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read by title.
|
|
|