05/25/2010 | Notice removed. | |||
05/20/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 25, 2010. | |||
05/20/2010 | Notice given. | |||
05/20/2010 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
05/13/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 20, 2010. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
05/12/2010 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). | |||
04/21/2010 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |||
04/20/2010 | Read by title. |