|
06/30/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 859.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 10, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Reported favorably (12-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read by title.
|
|
|