LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1462
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB1462
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB1462
Action History
05/05/2010
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
04/29/2010
Scheduled for floor debate on May 5, 2010.
04/27/2010
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
04/26/2010
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 1017 reported by the Committee on Judiciary (11-0-1).