|
07/06/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 995.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 63, nays 14. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: McPherson, Broome, and Erdey.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Jackson, Michael, Hutter, and White.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Notice House rejected Senate amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 12, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 938 reported by the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works (11-0).
|
|
|