|
07/08/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1044.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 12, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 1117 reported by the Committee on Ways and Means (10-0).
|
|
|