|
06/22/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 491.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 13, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 984 reported by the Committee on Health and Welfare (10-0).
|
|
|