|
07/02/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 952.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 68, nays 18, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 15. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 13, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 1191 reported by the Committee on Insurance (7-0).
|
|
|