LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1475
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB1475
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB1475
Action History
05/18/2010
Notice removed.
05/13/2010
Scheduled for floor debate on May 18, 2010.
05/13/2010
Notice given.
05/13/2010
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
05/07/2010
Scheduled for floor debate on May 13, 2010.
05/07/2010
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
05/06/2010
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 1210 reported by the Committee on Insurance (9-0).