|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 25. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 26, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 20, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 1425 reported by the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works (11-4-1).
|
|
|