|
07/02/2010
|
Effective date: July 2, 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 953.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 25, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 503 reported by the Committee on Judiciary (10-0-1).
|
|
|