|
07/08/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1046.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/3/2010.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 1151 reported by the Committee on Commerce (14-0).
|
|
|