05/03/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 10, 2010. | |||
04/26/2010 | Notice given. | |||
04/26/2010 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
04/22/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 26, 2010. | |||
04/20/2010 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/19/2010 | Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |||
03/05/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2010. | |||
03/04/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |||
03/04/2010 | Prefiled. |