06/03/2010 | Read by title, returned to the calendar by vote of 54 yeas and 37 nays. | |||
05/27/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/3/2010. | |||
05/26/2010 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
05/25/2010 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
03/12/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |||
03/08/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
03/08/2010 | Prefiled. |