LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB200
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB200
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB200
Action History
05/25/2010
Becomes HB 1490.
05/24/2010
Reported by substitute (16-0) (Regular)
03/29/2010
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
03/12/2010
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010.
03/08/2010
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
03/08/2010
Prefiled.