05/10/2010 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 38, nays 47. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
05/07/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 10, 2010. | |||
05/03/2010 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/29/2010 | Reported favorably (5-4) (Regular). | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |||
03/12/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |||
03/09/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |||
03/09/2010 | Prefiled. |