04/28/2010 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 30, nays 65. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
04/22/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 28, 2010. | |||
04/22/2010 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/21/2010 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |||
03/12/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |||
03/09/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |||
03/09/2010 | Prefiled. |