LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB256
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB256
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB256
Action History
04/08/2010
Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House.
04/08/2010
Discharged from the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
03/29/2010
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
03/12/2010
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010.
03/10/2010
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
03/10/2010
Prefiled.