|
06/29/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 690.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Abramson, Burns, Tim, and Lorusso.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Murray, Quinn, and Peterson.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Notice House rejected Senate amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 29, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Reported favorably (12-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|