|
07/08/2010
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2010
|
Becomes Act No. 1052.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 11. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 6, 2010.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2010
|
Reported favorably (12-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|