|
06/20/2010
|
Read by title. The Senate failed to approve consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 16 yeas and 16 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Senate floor amendments were read and adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 26, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Reported with amendments (12-0-2) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|