|
07/02/2010
|
Effective date: July 2, 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 31.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 3. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2010.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Read by title.
|
|
|