|
06/17/2010
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 4, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 26, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Reported with amendments (17-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|