|
06/17/2010
|
Reconsidered. Read by title as amended; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 11 yeas and 20 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 54, nays 32. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 19, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 4, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 48, nays 42. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 28, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|