Louisiana 2010 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB362 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                            HLS 10RS-473	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 2
Regular Session, 2010
HOUSE BILL NO. 362
BY REPRESENTATIVE EDWARDS
APPROPRIATIONS/JUDGMENT:  Appropriates funds for payment of judgment against
the State of La. in the suit entitled "Ricky Crawford, et al. v. Diamond B.
Construction, et al."
AN ACT1
To appropriate funds out of the General Fund of the state of Louisiana for Fiscal Year 2010-2
2011 to be used to pay the judgment in the suit entitled "Ricky Crawford and Lisa3
Crawford v. Diamond B. Construction, L.L.C., D/B/A Diamond B. Construction4
Company, Inc., State of Louisiana, through the Department of Transportation and5
Development and St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company"; to provide for6
interest; to provide for court costs; and to provide for related matters.7
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:8
Section 1.  The sum of Four Hundred Twenty-Three Thousand Six Hundred and9
No/100 ($423,600.00) Dollars, plus legal interest from February 9, 2001, until paid; plus10
court costs in the amount of Thirty-One Thousand Nine Hundred Three and 39/10011
($31,903.39) Dollars, plus legal interest from September 22, 2008, until paid; plus appeal12
costs in the amount of Seven Thousand Two Hundred Sixteen and 28/100 ($7,216.28)13
Dollars, plus legal interest from September 11, 2009, until paid, is hereby appropriated out14
of the General Fund of the state of Louisiana for Fiscal Year 2010-2011 to be used to pay15
the judgment in the suit entitled "Ricky Crawford and Lisa Crawford v. Diamond B.16
Construction, L.L.C., D/B/A Diamond B. Construction Company, Inc., State of Louisiana,17
through the Department of Transportation and Development and St. Paul Fire and Marine18
Insurance Company", bearing Number 2001–000480, Division "C" on the docket of the19 HLS 10RS-473	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 362
Page 2 of 2
Twenty-First Judicial District Court, parish of Tangipahoa, state of Louisiana; and bearing1
No. 2009 CA 0226 on the docket of the First Circuit Court of Appeal, state of Louisiana.2
Section 2. The judgment provided for in Section 1 hereof shall be deemed to have3
been paid on the effective date of this Act and legal interest shall cease to run as of that date.4
Section 3. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2010; if vetoed by the governor5
and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1,6
2010, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later. 7
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Edwards	HB No. 362
Appropriates from the state general fund for FY 2010-2011 the sum of $423,600, plus legal
interest from Feb. 9, 2001; plus court costs in the amount of $31,903.39, plus legal interest
from Sept. 22, 2008; plus appeal costs in the amount of $7,216.28, plus legal interest from
Sept. 11, 2009; to pay the judgment in "Ricky Crawford and Lisa Crawford v. Diamond B.
Construction, et al.", bearing No. 2001–000480, Div."C" on the docket of the 21
st
 JDC,
parish of Tangipahoa, state of La., and No. 2009 CA 0226 on the docket of the 1
st
 Circuit
Court of Appeal, state of La.
Effective July 1, 2010.