|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 28, nays 58. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 17, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 11, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read by title, House committee amendments rejected.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Reported favorably (9-8) (Regular) To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|