04/14/2010 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |||
04/14/2010 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 77, nays 21. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
04/08/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 14, 2010. | |||
04/08/2010 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/07/2010 | Reported with amendments (14-4) (Regular). | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
03/19/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |||
03/15/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
03/15/2010 | Prefiled. |