|
06/17/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 250.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/8/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 26, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Reported with amendments (17-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|