|
06/29/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 700.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 84, nays 3, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/17/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 8. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 3, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Reported with amendments (11-4) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|