|
05/26/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 40.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 27, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Reported favorably (16-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|