|
07/02/2010
|
Effective date: July 2, 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 917.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Mount, McPherson, and Heitmeier.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Notice House rejected Senate amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Mills, Katz, and Pearson.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 18, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|