|
06/15/2010
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 19, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Reported with amendments (13-0-1) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|