|
06/21/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 373.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Reported favorably (14-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|