|
06/14/2010
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 13 yeas and 17 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 8. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 5, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|